VA HB2220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-25 - Failed to pass in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops. Creates a new limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops. The bill sets out the privileges of this new license, including a requirement that at least 60 percent of the licensee's annual gross revenue be from the sale of premium tobacco products. The bill also defines cigar shop and sets out the state and local license taxes for this license.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; creates a new limited mixed beverage license for retail cigar shops.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (10-Y 30-N) (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (10-Y 30-N) (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (7-Y 6-N) (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 8-N) (Y: 7 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N 1-A) (Y: 84 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (17-Y 3-N) (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-25 | Senate | Failed to pass in Senate |
2017-02-25 | Senate | No further action taken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (10-Y 30-N) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (7-Y 6-N) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reconsidered by Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Rehabilitation and Social Services (7-Y 8-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (84-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (84-Y 11-N 1-A) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17102489D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2220E |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (17-Y 3-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102489D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 231 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |