VA HB2219 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Nursing homes; truth in advertising for inspections, surveys, and investigations. Requires that if inspection, survey, or investigation data is used in an advertisement regarding nursing homes, the advertisement also include the following information: (i) the date on which the survey, inspection, or investigation was conducted; (ii) a statement that the facility is required to submit a plan of correction in response to any and all statements of deficiencies; (iii) if a finding or deficiency cited in a statement of deficiencies has been corrected, a statement that the finding or deficiency has been corrected and the date on which the finding or deficiency was corrected; and (iv) a statement that the advertisement publication is not authorized or endorsed by the Virginia Department of Health, the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, the Office of the Inspector General, or any other governmental agency. The bill provides that failure to include this required information constitutes a violation of the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. The bill also requires that such information be in the same font, color, and size as the other text in the advertisement. Nursing homes; truth in advertising for inspections, surveys, and investigations. Requires that if inspection, survey, or investigation data is used in an advertisement regarding nursing homes, the advertisement also include the following information: (i) the date on which the survey, inspection, or investigation was conducted; (ii) a statement that the facility is required to submit a plan of correction in response to any and all statements of deficiencies; (iii) if a finding or deficiency cited in a statement of deficiencies has been corrected, a statement that the finding or deficiency has been corrected and the date on which the finding or deficiency was corrected; and (iv) a statement that the advertisement publication is not authorized or endorsed by the Virginia Department of Health, the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, the Office of the Inspector General, or any other governmental agency. The bill provides that failure to include this required information constitutes a violation of the Virginia Consumer Protection Act. The bill also requires that such information be in the same font, color, and size as the other text in the advertisement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nursing homes; truth in advertising for inspections, surveys, and investigations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N 1-A) (Y: 82 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2019-02-08SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 15-N 1-A)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (82-Y 15-N 1-A)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19102129D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2219E
2019-02-04HouseAmendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (17-Y 5-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102129D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321126(n/a)See Bill Text
591198(n/a)See Bill Text
591200(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback