VA HB2218 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public charter school applications and charter agreements; findings by the Board of Education. Permits the Board of Education to communicate any Board finding relating to the rationale for the local school board's denial of a public charter school application or revocation of or failure to renew the charter agreement based on documentation submitted by the school board in any school division in which at least half of the schools receive funding pursuant to Title I, Part A of the Elementary and Secondary Education Act of 1965, as amended.
Title
Public charter school applications and charter agreements; review by the Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 38-N) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 38-N) (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (16-Y 5-N) (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0513) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 513 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-28 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/28/17 |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2218ER) |
2017-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (58-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 38-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103567D-E |
2017-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2218E |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment by Delegate Miyares agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2017-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2017-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-01 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (16-Y 5-N) |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-20 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103567D |