VA HB2217 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Education; establishment of microcredential program. Permits the Department of Education to establish a microcredential program for the purpose of permitting any public elementary or secondary school teacher who holds a renewable or provisional license or any individual who participates in any alternate route to licensure program to complete additional in-person or blended coursework and earn microcredentials in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics (STEM) endorsement areas, including computer science, for which there is a high need for additional qualified teachers. The bill requires the Department of Education to direct the Advisory Board on Teacher Education and Licensure to convene a workgroup including pertinent education stakeholders to determine how any microcredential awarded pursuant to any such program will be used to award add-on endorsements and certifications for teachers in such STEM endorsement areas. The bill provides certain conditions in which in-person coursework in a microcredential program not contributing to an endorsement is eligible for professional development points towards the renewal of a teaching license. This bill is identical to SB 1419.
Title
Microcredential program; Department of Education may establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0227) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 227 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2217ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Engrossed bill reprinted 19103946D-E |
2019-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 19103946D-E |
2019-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2217E |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-23 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103946D |