VA HB2216 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2216

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program. Renames the Virginia Missing Child with Autism Alert Program to the Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program and expands it to apply to any missing person with autism, regardless of age. The bill defines a "missing person with autism" as any person (i) whose whereabouts are unknown, (ii) who has been diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder as defined by the Code of Virginia, and (iii) whose disappearance poses a credible threat to the safety and health of the person. Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program. Renames the Virginia Missing Child with Autism Alert Program to the Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program and expands it to apply to any missing person with autism, regardless of age. The bill defines a "missing person with autism" as any person (i) whose whereabouts are unknown, (ii) who has been diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder as defined by the Code of Virginia, and (iii) whose disappearance poses a credible threat to the safety and health of the person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Va. Missing Child w/ Autism Alert Program; renamed Va. Missing Person w/ Autism Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0189)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 189 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-24 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2216ER)
2021-02-19HouseEnrolled
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned PS sub: Public Safety
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Public Safety
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100556D

Same As/Similar To

HB2216 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2216
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2216+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2216ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0189+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2216F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2216FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1502C0005+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H15C0011+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1189+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11C0051+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S11V0015+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB2216+HB2216
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0054HB2216+HB2216

Bill Comments 750

feedback