VA HB2216 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2216
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program. Renames the Virginia Missing Child with Autism Alert Program to the Virginia Missing Person with Autism Alert Program and expands it to apply to any missing person with autism, regardless of age. The bill defines "a missing person with autism" as any person (i) whose whereabouts are unknown; (ii) who has been diagnosed with autism spectrum disorder as defined by the Code of Virginia; and (iii) whose disappearance poses a credible threat to the safety and health of the person.
Title
Va. Missing Child w/ Autism Alert Program; renames Va. Missing Person w/ Autism Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Public Safety (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100556D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2216 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)