VA HB2215 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Labor and Commerce
Pending: House Labor and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Small agricultural generators; manufacturer licensees. Includes in the definition of "small agricultural generator" a customer that operates a small agricultural generating facility as part of a business that (i) is located within the certificated service territory of an electric cooperative and (ii) has been granted a distiller's, limited distiller's, brewery, or limited brewery manufacturers license by the Board of Directors of the Virginia Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority.
Title
Small agricultural generators; definition, manufacturer licensees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB1994-Murphy) by voice vote |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100927D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1994 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)