VA HB2214 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Transportation and the University of Virginia; use agreement. Authorizes a use agreement between the Department of Transportation and the University of Virginia to permit the Department of Transportation use of the Shelburne Building on the University of Virginia Charlottesville campus for a period not to exceed 50 years.
Title
Transportation, Department of, and University of Virginia; use agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 24, 2017 | |
2017-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/17 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-15 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2214ER) |
2017-02-15 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-27 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102161D |
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Transportation
Uncodified Legislation
University of Virginia
Transportation
Uncodified Legislation
University of Virginia