VA HB2212 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2212

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Children's Services Act; effective monitoring and implementation. Requires the director of the Office of Children's Services to provide for the effective implementation of the Children's Services Act (§ 2.2-5200 et seq.) in all localities by (i) regularly monitoring local performance measures and child and family outcomes; (ii) using audit, performance, and outcomes data to identify local programs that need technical assistance; and (iii) working with local programs that are consistently underperforming to develop a corrective action plan for submission to the Office and the State Executive Council for Children's Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Services Act; effective monitoring and implementation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0226)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 226 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2212ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateRead third time
2021-02-17SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101765D

Same As/Similar To

HB2212 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222649(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2212
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2212+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2212ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0226+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2212F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2212FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1204C0005+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0069+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0205C0013+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0042+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1285+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0059+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0017+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0069+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0114HB2212+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0136HB2212+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0137HB2212+HB2212
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0138HB2212+HB2212

Bill Comments

feedback