VA HB2212 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Children's Services Act; effective monitoring and implementation. Requires the director of the Office of Children's Services to provide for the effective implementation of the Children's Services Act (§ 2.2-5200 et seq.) in all localities by (i) regularly monitoring local performance measures and child and family outcomes; (ii) using audit, performance, and outcomes data to identify local programs that need technical assistance; and (iii) working with local programs that are consistently underperforming to develop a corrective action plan for submission to the Office and the State Executive Council for Children's Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Services Act; effective monitoring and implementation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-02-02SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-01HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-28HouseRead first time
2021-01-27HouseReported from Appropriations (20-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2021-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Social Services
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101765D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222649(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback