VA HB2212 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm transfer and requires the Department of State Police to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a check from licensed firearms dealers. A transferor who fails to obtain a required background check and sells the firearm to another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts transfers between immediate family members, transfers that occur by operation of law, transfers by the executor or administrator of an estate or by the trustee of a testamentary trust, and temporary transfers that (i) occur within the continuous presence of the owner of the firearm; (ii) are necessary to prevent imminent death or serious bodily injury; (iii) occur at a shooting range, shooting gallery, or other area designed for the purpose of target shooting, for use during target practice, a firearms safety or training course or class, a shooting competition, or any similar lawful activity; or (iv) are for the purpose of and while the transferee is engaged in hunting, trapping, or target shooting. The bill removes the provision that makes background checks of prospective purchasers or transferees at firearms shows voluntary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks, penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-07HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
2017-01-17HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103677D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:5(n/a)See Bill Text
5414201.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback