VA HB2210 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; procurement of professional services. Allows any city located in Planning District 8 to procure architectural or professional engineering services relating to multiple construction projects where the sum of all such projects does not exceed $5 million. The bill also allows such localities to procure such services for a single project where the project does not exceed $1 million. Currently, only localities with a population in excess of 80,000 have this authority.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; procurement of professional services.
Sponsors
Del. James Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) (Y: 3 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in General Laws |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 3-N) |
2013-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement |
2013-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2013-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102935D |