VA HB2209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Motor vehicle safety inspection; new motor vehicle. Extends from 12 months to 24 months the validity period of the first motor vehicle safety inspection of a new motor vehicle.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle safety inspection; extends validity period for a new motor vehicle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Transportation
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102893D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4621158(n/a)See Bill Text
4621158.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback