VA HB2209 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Emergency Department Care Coordination Program established. Establishes the Emergency Department Care Coordination Program in the Department of Health to provide a single, statewide technology solution that connects all hospital emergency departments in the Commonwealth to facilitate real-time communication and collaboration between physicians, other health care providers, and other clinical and care management personnel for patients receiving services in hospital emergency departments, for the purpose of improving the quality of patient care services. The bill does not become effective unless and until the Commonwealth receives federal Health Information Technology for Economic and Clinical Health (HITECH) Act funds to implement its provisions. This bill is identical to SB 1561.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Department Care Coordination Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0600)
2017-03-16 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 600 (effective - see bill)
2017-03-13 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
2017-03-10SenateSigned by President
2017-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2209ER)
2017-03-07HouseEnrolled
2017-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2017-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Suetterlein, Lucas
2017-02-23SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2017-02-23HouseDelegates: O'Bannon, Ingram, Hester
2017-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2017-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2017-02-23SenateSenate requested conference committee
2017-02-23SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-22HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N)
2017-02-22HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 17105593D-S1 (0-Y 100-N)
2017-02-22HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2209S1
2017-02-21SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105593D-S1
2017-02-21SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-21SenateRead third time
2017-02-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateReported from Finance (13-Y 0-N)
2017-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105593D-S1
2017-02-16SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2017-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-07HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2017-02-06HousePrinted as engrossed 17104676D-EH1
2017-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2209EH1
2017-02-06HouseAppropriations Committee amendment agreed to
2017-02-06HouseHealth, Welfare and Institutions Committee substitute agreed to 17104676D-H1
2017-02-06HouseRead second time
2017-02-03HouseRead first time
2017-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with amendment (20-Y 0-N)
2017-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HouseAssigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources
2017-01-26HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 17104676D-H1
2017-01-26HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (11-Y 0-N)
2017-01-17HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103822D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321372(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2209
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2209+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2209H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2209EH1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2209S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2209ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+CHAP0600+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H1201V0021+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H12V0058+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0206V0008+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H02V0037+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1966+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S04V0262+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S05V0309+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0735HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0783HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0785HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0786HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2710+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0896HB2209+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2766+HB2209
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV1010HB2209+HB2209

Bill Comments 750

feedback