VA HB2209 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

General partnerships; formation. Provides that each person to be admitted as a partner to a general partnership may be admitted as a partner and may receive a partnership interest therein without making, or being required to make, a contribution to the partnership. The measure also provides that each person to be admitted as a partner to a partnership may be admitted as a partner without acquiring a transferable interest in the partnership. The measure does not affect provisions that prescribe a partner's liability for obligations of the partnership.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Partnerships; general formation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-26 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0616)
2015-03-26 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 616 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2209ER)
2015-02-24HouseEnrolled
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-16SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N)
2015-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2015-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-01-28HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2015-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2015-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2015-01-26HouseRead first time
2015-01-22HouseReported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2015-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 15101209D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback