VA HB2207 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19. Establishes a presumption that COVID-19 causing the death or disability of firefighters, emergency medical services personnel, law-enforcement officers, and correctional officers is an occupational disease compensable under the Workers' Compensation Act. The bill provides that the COVID-19 virus is established by a positive diagnostic test for COVID-19, an incubation period consistent with COVID-19, and signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that require medical treatment. The bill provides that such presumption applies to any death or disability occurring on or after March 12, 2020, caused by infection from the COVID-19 virus, provided that for any such death or disability that occurred on or after March 12, 2020, and prior to December 31, 2021, the claimant received a diagnosis of COVID-19 from a licensed physician, after either a presumptive positive test or a laboratory confirmed test for COVID-19, and presented with signs and symptoms of COVID-19 that required medical treatment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for COVID-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Passage (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseReported from Labor and Commerce (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-18HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100861D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback