VA HB2207 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Broadband Advisory Council; membership. Increases from 11 to 14 the membership of the Broadband Advisory Council (the Council) by (i) adding one member of the House of Delegates and one member of the Senate; (ii) removing one nonlegislative citizen member and requiring one of the Council's four nonlegislative citizen members, who shall be appointed by the Governor, to be a representative of the Wireless Internet Service Providers Association; and (iii) adding the executive director of the Center for Rural Virginia and the Secretary of Agriculture and Forestry as ex officio members. The bill also directs the Division of Legislative Services to provide additional staff support to legislative members serving on the Council. The bill contains technical amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Broadband Advisory Council; increases membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-17 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0239)
2015-03-17 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 239 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
2015-02-26SenateSigned by President
2015-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2207ER)
2015-02-24HouseEnrolled
2015-02-19SenatePassed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateRead third time
2015-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2015-02-16SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
2015-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2015-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2015-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2015-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2207H1
2015-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15104243D-H1
2015-01-30HouseRead second time
2015-01-29HouseRead first time
2015-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 15104243D-H1
2015-01-27HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2015-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
2015-01-20HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
2015-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2015-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 15103601D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222699.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2207
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2207+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2207H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2207ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0239+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H1104V0008+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H11V0036+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1764+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S12V0131+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0559HB2207+HB2207
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0615HB2207+HB2207

Bill Comments 750

feedback