VA HB2207 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-06 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Sale, transfer, etc., of certain firearms and firearms magazines; penalty. Provides that a person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers an assault firearm is guilty of a Class 6 felony. The bill also provides that a person who imports, sells, barters, or transfers a firearms magazine that is designed to hold more than 20 rounds of ammunition is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Finally, the bill provides an exception from both penalties for law-enforcement officers and military personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms and firearms magazines, certain; unlawful to sell, import, etc., penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-06HouseLeft in Militia, Police and Public Safety
2013-01-17HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote
2013-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: #1
2013-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2013-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 13103146D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182308.2:01(n/a)See Bill Text
182309.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback