VA HB2206 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2206

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child Care Subsidy Program; emergency. Provides that regulations governing the Child Care Subsidy Program (the Program) shall be amended to provide that (i) a family shall be eligible for assistance through the Program if the family's income does not exceed 85 percent of the state median income, the family includes at least one child who is five years of age or younger and has not yet started kindergarten, and the family meets all other income and eligibility requirements of the Program and (ii) job search activities shall be considered eligible activities for the purposes of the Program. The bill provides that a family determined to be eligible for assistance through the Program shall be eligible to receive assistance for a period of 12 months or until the family's household income exceeds 85 percent of the state median income, whichever occurs sooner. The Department of Social Services shall administer the program, as amended by the bill, in cooperation with the Department of Education. The bill contains an emergency clause and provides that the provisions of the bill shall be applicable to applications for assistance through the Program received prior to August 1, 2021. Child Care Subsidy Program; emergency. Provides that regulations governing the Child Care Subsidy Program (the Program) shall be amended to provide that (i) a family shall be eligible for assistance through the Program if the family's income does not exceed 85 percent of the state median income, the family includes at least one child who is five years of age or younger and has not yet started kindergarten, and the family meets all other income and eligibility requirements of the Program and (ii) job search activities shall be considered eligible activities for the purposes of the Program. The bill provides that a family determined to be eligible for assistance through the Program shall be eligible to receive assistance for a period of 12 months or until the family's household income exceeds 85 percent of the state median income, whichever occurs sooner. The Department of Social Services shall administer the program, as amended by the bill, in cooperation with the Department of Education. The bill contains an emergency clause and provides that the provisions of the bill shall be applicable to applications for assistance through the Program received prior to August 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Care Subsidy Program; expanding Program to serve more families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (92-Y 7-N) (Y: 92 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0171)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 171 (effective 3/18/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2206ER)
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled
2021-02-19HouseVOTE: Adoption (92-Y 7-N)
2021-02-19HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 21200307D-S1 (92-Y 7-N)
2021-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate with substitute (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB2206S1
2021-02-17SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 21200307D-S1
2021-02-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateCommittee substitute printed 21200307D-S1
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2021-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-11SenateRereferred from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-02HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2206H1
2021-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103864D-H1
2021-02-01HouseRead second time
2021-01-29HouseRead first time
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103864D-H1
2021-01-28HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102769D

Same As/Similar To

HB2206 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2206
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2206+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2206H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2206S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2206ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0171+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2206FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2206FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0078+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1326+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04C0125+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0017+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0025+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0072HB2206+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0105HB2206+HB2206
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1787+HB2206

Bill Comments

feedback