VA HB2205 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Same-day voter registration; repeal. Repeals Chapter 1153 of the Acts of Assembly of 2020, which provided that any person who is qualified to register to vote would be permitted to do so up to and including on the day of the election, regardless of the close of the registration records provided elsewhere in law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Same-day voting; repeals provision relating to voting after registration records close.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05HouseLeft in Privileges and Elections
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned P & E sub: Voting Rights
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101693D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback