VA HB2205 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Family life education; consent. Requires any high school family life education curriculum offered by a local school division to incorporate age-appropriate elements of effective and evidence-based programs on the law and meaning of consent. Under current law, such elements are permissive in any high school family life education curriculum.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family life education; consent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (91-Y 9-N) (Y: 91 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N) (Y: 88 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0372)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 372 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2205ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (91-Y 9-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 9-N)
2019-02-20HouseReconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House
2019-02-20HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-20HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-19SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-19SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-18SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendments waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Education sub: Public Education
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (88-Y 10-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (88-Y 10-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104038D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221207.1:1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2205
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2205+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2205ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0372+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0019+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0071+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2497+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0253+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2205+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2205+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3167+HB2205
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3171+HB2205

Bill Comments

feedback