VA HB2204 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2204
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program established. Establishes the Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and requires the Virginia Community College System to establish the G3 Program for the purpose of providing financial assistance from the Fund to certain low-income and middle-income Virginia students who are enrolled in an educational program at an associate-degree-granting public institution of higher education that leads to an occupation in a high-demand field. The bill contains provisions for student eligibility, financial assistance award amounts, and data reporting.
Title
Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program; created and established, report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0397) | |
2021-03-29 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 397 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2204ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102671D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2204 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
SB1405 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
SB1405 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
SB1405 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
SB1405 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0398)
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Study Commissions Committees and Reports