VA HB2204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program established. Establishes the Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and requires the Virginia Community College System to establish the G3 Program for the purpose of providing financial assistance from the Fund to certain low-income and middle-income Virginia students who are enrolled in an educational program at an associate-degree-granting public institution of higher education that leads to an occupation in a certain high-demand field. The bill contains provisions for student eligibility, financial assistance award amounts, and data reporting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Get Skilled, Get a Job, Give Back (G3) Fund and Program; established.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N) (Y: 93 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (93-Y 7-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (93-Y 7-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned Education sub: Post-Secondary and Higher Ed
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102671D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2312911.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback