VA HB2203 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2203

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program and Fund; established. Requires the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Commissioner) to establish the Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program (VAFA Program) for Virginia farmers and food producers to donate, sell, or otherwise provide agriculture products to charitable food assistance organizations. The bill also creates the Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Fund to disburse moneys to such charitable food assistance organizations to reimburse farmers or food producers for any costs associated with harvesting, processing, packaging, or transporting agriculture products donated to such charitable food assistance organizations. The bill authorizes the Commissioner to adopt guidelines and regulations to carry out the VAFA Program, which must prohibit grant recipients from attributing more than 10 percent of the grant amount to administrative costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program and Fund; established and created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0332)
2021-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 332 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2203ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-25HouseVOTE: Adoption (95-Y 4-N)
2021-02-25HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (95-Y 4-N)
2021-02-25HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-25SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-25SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-25SenateAmendment by Senator Locke withdrawn
2021-02-25SenateFinance and Appropriations Committee amendment agreed to
2021-02-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-25SenateAgriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources Committee amendment rejected
2021-02-25SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-25SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-25SenateRead third time
2021-02-24SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2021-02-16SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendment (13-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N)
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102121D

Same As/Similar To

HB2203 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
SB1188 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)
SB1188 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0333)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
324780(n/a)See Bill Text
324783(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2203
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2203+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2203ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0332+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2203AS
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200353A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2203ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2203ASR
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2203F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2203FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0101C0004+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0042+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0201C0004+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0023+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1234+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0078+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01V0022+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S05V0089+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0397HB2203+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0475HB2203+HB2203
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1986+HB2203

Bill Comments 750

feedback