VA HB2203 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program and Fund; established. Requires the Commissioner of Agriculture and Consumer Services (the Commissioner) to establish the Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program (VAFA Program) for Virginia farmers and food producers to donate, sell, or otherwise provide agriculture products to charitable food assistance organizations. The bill also creates the Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Fund to disburse moneys to such charitable food assistance organizations to reimburse farmers or food producers for any costs associated with harvesting, processing, packaging, or transporting agriculture products donated to such charitable food assistance organizations. The bill authorizes the Commissioner to adopt guidelines and regulations to carry out the VAFA Program.
Title
Virginia Agriculture Food Assistance Program and Fund; established and created.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) (Y: 97 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-28 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2021-01-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102121D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2203 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)