VA HB2201 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Association health plans; base rates based on employer member's risk profile. Provides that for association health plans, an insurer may (i) establish base rates formed on an actuarially sound, modified community rating methodology that considers the pooling of all participant claims and (ii) utilize each employer member's specific risk profile to determine contribution rates for each individual employer member's share of the premium by actuarially adjusting above or below established base rates.
Title
Association health plans; rates based on employer member's risk profile.
Sponsors
Del. Kathy Byron [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0514) | |
2023-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 514 (effective - 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2201ER) |
2023-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 1-N) |
2023-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Dunnavant agreed to |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-01-31 | House | VOTE: (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-30 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2201H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23104883D-H1 |
2023-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee substitute printed 23104883D-H1 |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2023-01-16 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101925D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1171 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
SB1171 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)
SB1171 (Same As) 2023-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0515)