VA HB2201 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB2201

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Solar and energy storage projects; siting agreements and special exceptions throughout the Commonwealth. Expands existing provisions related to siting agreements and zoning special exceptions for solar projects located in an opportunity zone to include energy storage projects and makes the provisions statewide. The bill provides that its provisions shall not apply to any energy storage project that has received zoning and site plan approval, preliminary or otherwise, from the host locality before January 1, 2021. The bill also provides that its provisions shall not become effective with respect to energy storage projects unless the General Assembly approves legislation that authorizes localities to adopt an ordinance for taxation of energy storage projects such as solar projects with a local option for machinery and tools tax or solar revenue share.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Solar and energy storage projects; siting agreements throughout the Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N) (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (71-Y 29-N) (Y: 71 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0057)
2021-03-11 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 57 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-25 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
2021-02-24HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-22SenateSigned by President
2021-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2201ER)
2021-02-22HouseEnrolled
2021-02-17SenatePassed Senate (34-Y 3-N 1-A)
2021-02-17SenatePassed by temporarily
2021-02-17SenateRead third time
2021-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2021-02-15SenateReported from Local Government (11-Y 3-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Passage (71-Y 29-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House (71-Y 29-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (15-Y 7-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102743D

Same As/Similar To

HB2201 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
SB1207 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)
SB1207 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0058)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522288.8(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.6(n/a)See Bill Text
1522316.9(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2201
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2201+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2201ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0057+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0702C0012+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H07C0021+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1201+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S07C0040+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S07V0009+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0071HB2201+HB2201
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0111HB2201+HB2201

Bill Comments

feedback