VA HB2201 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Public school buildings; carbon monoxide detectors. Directs the Board of Education to include in its regulations a provision requiring that all new construction of, additions to, and alterations of public school buildings include the installation of at least one carbon monoxide detector.
Title
Public school buildings; carbon monoxide detectors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2013-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2013-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action |
2013-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2013-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 13102886D |