VA HB2201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Planning and Budget; payroll services. Provides that the Department of Planning and Budget, in consultation with the Department of Accounts, shall require all agencies of the Commonwealth to participate to the fullest extent feasible in the Payroll Service Bureau operated by the Department of Accounts. Any agency identified by the Department of Planning and Budget not participating in the Payroll Service Bureau as of July 1, 2011, may be exempted from such participation if it can demonstrate to the satisfaction of the Department of Planning and Budget that participation is not feasible or fiscally advantageous.
Title
Payroll Services Bureau; DPB to require participation of executive branch state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0122) | |
2011-03-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 122 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-03-06 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-03-03 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-03 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2201ER) | |
2011-03-03 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-26 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-26 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senators: Locke, Wampler, Barker | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2011-02-24 | House: Delegates: Comstock, Anderson, James | |
2011-02-24 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2011-02-24 | House: House acceded to request | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2011-02-24 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) | |
2011-02-23 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Amendments by Senator Locke agreed to | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2011-02-21 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-18 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2011-02-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-08 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2011-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws (21-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-20 | House: Assigned GL sub: #4 Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101798D |