VA HB2200 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-11 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limitations on disclosure and use of health information. Prohibits every agency of the Commonwealth or political subdivision of the Commonwealth from disclosing or using information contained in an individual's health record without the written consent of the individual and requires agencies of the Commonwealth or political subdivisions of the Commonwealth to provide to the individual, upon his request and without charge, an accounting of disclosures of health records made by the agency.
Title
Health information; limitations on disclosure and use of individual's information.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Berg [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (10-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-14 | House | Presented and ordered printed 15103499D |