VA HB2199 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Health Insurance Reform Commission; review of essential health benefits plan. Requires that the Health Insurance Reform Commission review the essential health benefits benchmark plan and establish a process for such review. The bill requires the Commission, in coordination with the Bureau of Insurance, to conduct a review of the essential health benefits benchmark plan in 2025 and every five years thereafter. The bill requires during such review (i) the Bureau to convene a stakeholder work group to make recommendations to the Commission, (ii) the Bureau to estimate the effects of certain referred legislation on the costs of health coverage in the Commonwealth, (iii) the Commission to determine if any changes are to be made to the benchmark plan and to identify such changes, (iv) the Bureau to conduct an actuarial analysis of any changes identified by the Commission, and (v) the Commission to determine which changes will be recommended and to make a recommendation to the General Assembly in the form of a bill that directs the Bureau to select a new benchmark plan that includes any such changes at the next regular session of the General Assembly. The bill (a) requires public hearings to be held throughout the process, (b) establishes a timeline for each step of the process, and (c) requires the Bureau to maintain a website to convey relevant information regarding the process to the public. As introduced, this bill was a recommendation of the Health Insurance Reform Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance Reform Commission; review of essential health benefits benchmark plan.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-27 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0698)
2023-03-27 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 698 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-23SenateSigned by President
2023-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2023-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2199ER)
2023-02-21HouseEnrolled
2023-02-16SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-16SenateRead third time
2023-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-13SenateReported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2023-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-30HouseVOTE: (100-Y 0-N)
2023-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2023-01-27HousePrinted as engrossed 23102586D-E
2023-01-27HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2199E
2023-01-27HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2023-01-27HouseRead second time
2023-01-26HouseRead first time
2023-01-24HouseReported from Commerce and Energy with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102586D

Same As/Similar To

SB1397 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)
SB1397 (Same As) 2023-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0699)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB2199
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2199+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2199E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB2199ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0698+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB2199AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2199F171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2199FE171+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB2199FER171+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H23V0030+HB2199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1192+HB2199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S02V0133+HB2199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0505HB2199+HB2199
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0532HB2199+HB2199

Bill Comments

feedback