VA HB2196 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-08 - House: Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Government Transparency Act. Establishes a searchable database website that would allow persons to search and aggregate information including but not limited to (i) individual or specific appropriations or budget items, (ii) state agency spending and procurement data, (iii) financial disclosure statements, (iv) audit and state agency performance reports, and (v) contact information for public records access purposes. Under the bill, the searchable database website will be developed and maintained by the Department of Planning and Budget and is required to be operational by July 1, 2012. When fully operational, all data in the database would be maintained for a minimum of 10 years. The bill requires the Department to work with the Auditor of Public Accounts and the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission to avoid duplication of effort. The bill also establishes the Government Transparency Advisory Council to advise the Department on the practical usability of the website, considering all intended end users.
Title
Government Transparency Advisory Council; established, searchable database website established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2011-02-04 | House: Assigned App. sub: Technology Oversight and Government Activities | |
2011-02-03 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | House: Reported from General Laws (20-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: #2 FOIA/Procurement | |
2011-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2011-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11103690D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 2699.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2699.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3720 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3726 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |