VA HB2194 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalties. Provides that any person 18 years of age or older who communicates a threat in writing, including an electronically transmitted communication producing a visual or electronic message, to another to kill or to do serious bodily injury to any other person and makes such threat with the intent to (i) intimidate a civilian population at large; (ii) influence the conduct or activities of a government, including the government of the United States, a state, or a locality, through intimidation; or (iii) compel the emergency evacuation, or avoidance, of any place of assembly, any building or other structure, or any means of mass transportation is guilty of a Class 5 felony. The bill provides that any person younger than 18 years of age who commits such offense is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalties. Provides that any person 18 years of age or older who communicates a threat in writing, including an electronically transmitted communication producing a visual or electronic message, to another to kill or to do serious bodily injury to any other person and makes such threat with the intent to (i) intimidate a civilian population at large; (ii) influence the conduct or activities of a government, including the government of the United States, a state, or a locality, through intimidation; or (iii) compel the emergency evacuation, or avoidance, of any place of assembly, any building or other structure, or any means of mass transportation is guilty of a Class 5 felony. The bill provides that any person younger than 18 years of age who commits such offense is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicating threats of death or bodily injury to a person with intent to intimidate; penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-05HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2194H1
2021-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21104392D-H1
2021-02-04HouseRead second time
2021-02-03HouseRead first time
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute printed 21104392D-H1
2021-02-03HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101561D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18283.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB2194
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2194+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB2194H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21104137.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104027D.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2194F160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2194F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2194FH1160+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB2194FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0801V0049+HB2194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H08V0141+HB2194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1473+HB2194
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S03V0155+HB2194

Bill Comments

feedback