VA HB2194 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Noxious weeds; golden bamboo. Designates golden bamboo as a noxious weed and authorizes any locality to adopt an ordinance to prevent, control, and abate the growth, importation, or spread of golden bamboo.
Title
Noxious weeds; golden bamboo.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-19 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100517D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2194 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2194+hil |