VA HB2193 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2193

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Settlement agreements; stay of dismissal. Provides that, in any case in which a plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff is seeking a civil judgment against a defendant or counterclaim defendant, if the parties enter into a written settlement agreement, upon request of the parties, a dismissal of such case shall be stayed to allow for full compliance with such settlement agreement. The bill requires the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a notice of dismissal with the court once the defendant or counterclaim defendant has complied with the terms of such settlement agreement, which shall be treated as a dismissal with prejudice. The bill allows the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a motion to enforce the terms of such settlement agreement if a defendant or counterclaim defendant is in default of any term of such agreement. Settlement agreements; stay of dismissal. Provides that, in any case in which a plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff is seeking a civil judgment against a defendant or counterclaim defendant, if the parties enter into a written settlement agreement, upon request of the parties, a dismissal of such case shall be stayed to allow for full compliance with such settlement agreement. The bill requires the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a notice of dismissal with the court once the defendant or counterclaim defendant has complied with the terms of such settlement agreement, which shall be treated as a dismissal with prejudice. The bill allows the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a motion to enforce the terms of such settlement agreement if a defendant or counterclaim defendant is in default of any term of such agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Settlement agreements; staying of dismissal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (12-Y 26-N) (Y: 12 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (1-Y 95-N) (Y: 1 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01SenateFailed to pass
2021-03-01SenateNo further action taken
2021-02-27SenateConference report rejected by Senate (12-Y 26-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference substitute printed 21200799D-H2
2021-02-27 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-25SenateSenators: Petersen, Boysko, Norment
2021-02-25SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-25HouseDelegates: Leftwich, Heretick, Simon
2021-02-25HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-25HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-24SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-24SenateSenate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-23HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 95-N)
2021-02-23HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 95-N)
2021-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-22SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-22SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-02-22SenateReading of amendment waived
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-17SenateReported from Judiciary with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateAssigned Judiciary sub: Civil Law
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2193H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103615D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103615D-H1
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101027D

Same As/Similar To

HB2193 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801425.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2193
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2193+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2193H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2193H2+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/.htm
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21200295A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2193AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2193ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB2193AC
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0802C0019+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H08C0133+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1364+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1426+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03C0163+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S03V0047+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB2193+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0266HB2193+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1889+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0405HB2193+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0582HB2193+HB2193

Bill Comments 750

feedback