VA HB2193 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Throwing or depositing certain substances on the highway; grass. Adds grass to the list of substances a person shall not throw or deposit or cause to be deposited upon any highway so as to create a hazard to the traveling public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grass; throwing or depositing certain substances on the highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101802D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182324(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback