VA HB2193 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Personal property tax; business property. Requires localities to permit taxpayers to provide an aggregate estimate of the total cost of all personal property used in a business that has an original cost of less than $500, in lieu of a specific, itemized list. Under current law, localities are permitted to allow taxpayers to provide such estimate of aggregate cost for property whose original cost is less than $250.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal property tax; business property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-21 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0116)
2017-02-21 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 116 (effective 7/1/17)
2017-02-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2017
2017-02-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/15/17
2017-02-15SenateSigned by President
2017-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2193ER)
2017-02-14HouseEnrolled
2017-02-10SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-10SenateRead third time
2017-02-09SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateReported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
2017-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-02-02HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-02HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2017-02-01HouseRead second time and engrossed
2017-01-31HouseRead first time
2017-01-30HouseReported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N)
2017-01-20HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2017-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2017-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100521D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5813506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback