VA HB2193 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Use of grant funds for battlefield preservation. Expands the types of battlefields eligible to receive grants from the Virginia Battlefield Preservation Fund (the Fund), previously known as the Civil War Site Preservation Fund. Currently, moneys in the Fund can only be used for making grants to private nonprofit organizations for the fee simple purchase of, or purchase of protective interests in, Civil War historic sites. The bill allows the awarding of grants to protect Revolutionary War and War of 1812 historic battlefields.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Battlefield Preservation Fund; use of grant funds for battlefield preservation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-23 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0467)
2015-03-23 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 467 (effective 7/1/15)
2015-03-10 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
2015-03-10HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
2015-03-07SenateSigned by President
2015-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2015-03-06HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2193ER)
2015-03-06HouseEnrolled
2015-02-25HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 0-N)
2015-02-25HouseSenate amendments agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N)
2015-02-24HousePlaced on Calendar
2015-02-24SenatePassed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
2015-02-24SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2015-02-24SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2015-02-24SenateReading of amendments waived
2015-02-24SenateRead third time
2015-02-23SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2015-02-19SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
2015-02-10SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2015-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2015-02-09HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-09HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
2015-02-06HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2193H1
2015-02-06HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 15104688D-H1
2015-02-06HouseRead second time
2015-02-05HouseRead first time
2015-02-04HouseCommittee substitute printed 15104688D-H1
2015-02-04HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2015-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2015-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 15103391D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012202.4(n/a)See Bill Text
221509.4(n/a)See Bill Text
581512(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB2193
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2193+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2193H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB2193ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+CHAP0467+hil
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+H01V0046+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV1962+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+S01V0085+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0736HB2193+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+SV0789HB2193+HB2193
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+vot+HV2798+HB2193

Bill Comments 750

feedback