VA HB2193 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child abuse investigations; employees of school divisions. Expands the class of individuals whom a local department of social services must report to a local school board upon determination that a complaint alleging that such individual has committed child abuse or neglect is a founded complaint from any full-time, part-time, permanent, or temporary teacher to any full-time, part-time, permanent, or temporary employee of a school division.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child abuse investigations; employees of school divisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0506)
2013-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 506 (effective 7/1/13)
2013-02-22SenateSigned by President
2013-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2013-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2193ER)
2013-02-21HouseEnrolled
2013-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-18SenateRead third time
2013-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2013-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2013-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2013-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2013-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2013-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2013-02-01HouseRead first time
2013-01-31HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
2013-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2013-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 13103172D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321505(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback