VA HB2193 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Settlement agreements; stay of dismissal. Provides that, in any case in which a plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff is seeking a civil judgment against a defendant or counterclaim defendant, if the parties enter into a written settlement agreement, upon request of the parties, a dismissal of such case shall be stayed to allow for full compliance with such settlement agreement. The bill requires the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a notice of dismissal with the court once the defendant or counterclaim defendant has complied with the terms of such settlement agreement, which shall be treated as a dismissal with prejudice. The bill allows the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a motion to enforce the terms of such settlement agreement if a defendant or counterclaim defendant is in default of any term of such agreement. Settlement agreements; stay of dismissal. Provides that, in any case in which a plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff is seeking a civil judgment against a defendant or counterclaim defendant, if the parties enter into a written settlement agreement, upon request of the parties, a dismissal of such case shall be stayed to allow for full compliance with such settlement agreement. The bill requires the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a notice of dismissal with the court once the defendant or counterclaim defendant has complied with the terms of such settlement agreement, which shall be treated as a dismissal with prejudice. The bill allows the plaintiff or counterclaim plaintiff to file a motion to enforce the terms of such settlement agreement if a defendant or counterclaim defendant is in default of any term of such agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Settlement agreements; staying of dismissal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2021-02-03HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-03HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A)
2021-02-02HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2193H1
2021-02-02HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103615D-H1
2021-02-02HouseRead second time
2021-02-01HouseRead first time
2021-01-29HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103615D-H1
2021-01-27HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101027D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
801425.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback