VA HB2192 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Domestic relations; contents of support orders; unemployment benefits. Requires support orders to contain a provision requiring an obligor to keep the Department of Social Services or a court informed of, in addition to the name, address, and telephone number of his current employer, any change to his employment status and if he has filed a claim for or is receiving unemployment benefits. The bill further requires that the provision shall further specify that any such change or filing be communicated to the Department of Social Services or the court in writing within 30 days of such change or filing. Domestic relations; contents of support orders; unemployment benefits. Requires support orders to contain a provision requiring an obligor to keep the Department of Social Services or a court informed of, in addition to the name, address, and telephone number of his current employer, any change to his employment status and if he has filed a claim for or is receiving unemployment benefits. The bill further requires that the provision shall further specify that any such change or filing be communicated to the Department of Social Services or the court in writing within 30 days of such change or filing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Support orders; contents of orders, change in employment status, unemployment benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Judiciary (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on the Judiciary
2021-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-27HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2192H1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103496D-H1
2021-01-26HouseRead second time
2021-01-25HouseRead first time
2021-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103496D-H1
2021-01-20HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned Courts sub: Civil
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100864D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback