VA HB2189 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requirements to test for PFAS; publicly owned treatment works; discharges into state waters. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations that require any industrial user of publicly owned treatment works that receive and clean, repair, refurbish, or process items that the industrial user knows or reasonably should know use PFAS chemicals, defined in the bill, to test wastestreams for PFAS prior to and after cleaning, repairing, refurbishing, or processing such items. The bill requires the results of such tests to be transmitted to the receiving publicly owned treatment works within three days of receipt of the test results by the industrial user of the publicly owned treatment works. Requirements to test for PFAS; publicly owned treatment works; discharges into state waters. Directs the State Water Control Board to adopt regulations that require any industrial user of publicly owned treatment works that receive and clean, repair, refurbish, or process items that the industrial user knows or reasonably should know use PFAS chemicals, defined in the bill, to test wastestreams for PFAS prior to and after cleaning, repairing, refurbishing, or processing such items. The bill requires the results of such tests to be transmitted to the receiving publicly owned treatment works within three days of receipt of the test results by the industrial user of the publicly owned treatment works.
Title
PFAS chemicals; requirements to test, publicly owned treatment works.
Sponsors
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-22 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0276) | |
2023-03-22 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 276 (effective 7/1/23) | |
2023-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023 | |
2023-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023 |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2189ER) |
2023-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-07 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2189H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 23106081D-H1 |
2023-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-01 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2023-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 23106081D-H1 |
2023-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 2-N) |
2023-01-20 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2023-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23101593D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 1 | 44.15:5.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |