VA HB2188 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-07 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

School psychologists; staffing flexibility. School psychologists; staffing flexibility. Provides that in order to fill vacant school psychologist positions, any local school board may employ, under a provisional license issued by the Department of Education for three school years with an allowance for an additional two-year extension with the approval of the division superintendent, clinical psychologists licensed by the Board of Psychology, provided that any such individual makes progress toward completing the requirements for full licensure as a school psychologist during such period of employment. This bill is a recommendation of the Behavioral Health Commission and the Joint Legislative Audit and Review Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School psychologists; staffing flexibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-07HouseLeft in Education
2023-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2023-01-17HouseAssigned Education sub: Early Childhood/Innovation
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2023-01-11HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102218D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
221253.13:2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback