VA HB2187 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB2187

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commonwealth Center for Recurrent Flooding Resiliency; development of Flood Resiliency Clearinghouse Program. Directs the Commonwealth Center for Recurrent Flooding Resiliency (the Center) to evaluate the development of a Flood Resiliency Clearinghouse Program and to work with the Department of Conservation and Recreation to evaluate solutions that manage both water quality and flooding and emphasize nature-based solutions. The bill requires the Center to report its findings by November 1, 2021. Commonwealth Center for Recurrent Flooding Resiliency; development of Flood Resiliency Clearinghouse Program. Directs the Commonwealth Center for Recurrent Flooding Resiliency (the Center) to evaluate the development of a Flood Resiliency Clearinghouse Program and to work with the Department of Conservation and Recreation to evaluate solutions that manage both water quality and flooding and emphasize nature-based solutions. The bill requires the Center to report its findings by November 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recurrent Flooding Resiliency, Commonwealth Center for; study topics to manage water quality, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0150)
2021-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 150 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-02-26 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-02-26HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
2021-02-25HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-24SenateSigned by President
2021-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2187ER)
2021-02-24HouseEnrolled
2021-02-19SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-19SenateRead third time
2021-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-16SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2021-01-29SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-28HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2187H1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103241D-H1
2021-01-27HouseRead second time
2021-01-26HouseRead first time
2021-01-25HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2021-01-20HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-20HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103241D-H1
2021-01-20HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake
2021-01-13HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2021-01-13HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102677D

Same As/Similar To

HB2187 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB2187
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2187+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2187H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB2187ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0150+hil
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2187FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB2187FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0102C0003+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H01C0033+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H0206C0001+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H02C0027+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1223+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01C0077+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S01V0013+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0174HB2187+HB2187
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0206HB2187+HB2187

Bill Comments 750

feedback