VA HB2187 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks; penalty. Requires a background check for any firearm transfer and requires the Department of State Police to establish a process for transferors to obtain such a check from licensed firearms dealers. A transferor who fails to obtain a required background check and sells the firearm to another person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill exempts transfers between immediate family members, transfers that occur by operation of law, transfers by the executor or administrator of an estate or by the trustee of a testamentary trust, and temporary transfers that occur in the presence of the owner of the firearm or are necessary to prevent imminent death or serious bodily injury. The bill removes the provision that makes background checks of prospective purchasers or transferees at firearms shows voluntary.
Title
Firearm transfers; criminal history record information checks required, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103088D |
Subjects
Crimes and Offenses Generally
Criminal History Information
Criminal Procedure
Firearms
Professions and Occupations
Weapons
Criminal History Information
Criminal Procedure
Firearms
Professions and Occupations
Weapons
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.2:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB2187 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB2187+hil |