VA HB2186 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2186
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Industrial Development and Revenue Bond Act; directors; Mathews County. Provides that the Mathews County board of supervisors may appoint one employee of the locality onto the board of directors for the Economic Development Authority of the County of Mathews. Under current law, no locality's economic development authority director may be an officer or employee of the relevant locality with certain exceptions for towns with a population of less than 3,500 and Buchanan and Frederick Counties.
Title
Mathews County; appointment of bd. of director to the Economic Development Authority of the County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-22 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101934D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2186 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Local Government (15-Y 0-N)