VA HB2186 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Travel insurance. Establishes procedures and requirements for travel protection plans and travel administrators. The measure establishes travel insurance as an inland marine line of insurance sold by property and casualty insurance agents. The measure (i) prohibits any person from acting as a limited lines travel insurance agent unless properly licensed, (ii) prohibits any person from acting as a travel retailer unless properly registered, and (iii) authorizes the State Corporation Commission to take enforcement actions, including suspending, revoking, or terminating a license. The measure establishes a premium tax on travel insurance premiums paid by residents of the Commonwealth and establishes acceptable practices for the sale and advertising of travel insurance. The measure applies to travel insurance policies purchased on or after July 1, 2019. This bill is identical to SB 1565.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Travel insurance; establishes procedures and requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 346 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2186ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-13SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-13SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2186H1
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105372D-H1
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105372D-H1
2019-01-24HouseReported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-08HouseReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2019-01-08HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102434D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3821887(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888.1(n/a)See Bill Text
3821888.4(n/a)See Bill Text
5812501.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2186
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2186+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2186H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2186ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0346+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H14V0028+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1976+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2022+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S02V0138+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2186+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2805+HB2186
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0548HB2186+HB2186

Bill Comments

feedback