VA HB2185 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2185
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; exemption for personal protective equipment; emergency. Establishes a retail sales and use tax exemption for personal protective equipment, defined in the bill. The exemption is available to any business that has in place a COVID-19 safety protocol that complies with the Emergency Temporary Standard promulgated by the Virginia Department of Labor and Industry and that meets other criteria. The exemption sunsets on the first day following the expiration of the last executive order issued by the Governor related to the COVID-19 pandemic and the termination of the COVID-19 Emergency Temporary Standard and any permanent COVID-19 regulations adopted by the Virginia Safety and Health Codes Board.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0055) | |
2021-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 55 (effective 3/11/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2185ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102420D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
SB1403 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
SB1403 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
SB1403 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)
SB1403 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0056)