VA HB2185 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2185
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Sales tax; exemption for personal protective equipment; emergency. Establishes a retail sales and use tax exemption for personal protective equipment, defined in the bill. The exemption would be available to any business that has in place a COVID-19 safety protocol that complies with the Emergency Temporary Standard promulgated by the Virginia Department of Labor and Industry and that meets other criteria. The exemption would sunset one day after the first day following the expiration of the last executive order issued by the Governor related to the COVID-19 pandemic and the termination of the COVID-19 Emergency Temporary Standard and any permanent COVID-19 regulations adopted by the Virginia Safety and Health Codes Board. The bill contains an emergency clause.
Title
Retail Sales and Use Tax; exemption for personal protective equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-05 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-03 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-16 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/13/21 21102420D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2185 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)