VA HB2185 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; granting of certain mixed beverage licenses. Provides that, notwithstanding the requirement for a referendum for liquor by the drink, the Alcoholic Beverage Control Board may issue a mixed beverage license to establishments located on property (i) 2,135 feet north of the intersection of State Routes 1223 and 661 (Meadows Golf and Swim Club); (ii) on State Route 685 approximately 1,128 feet west of the intersection of State Routes 652 and 685; and (iii) adjacent to State Route 697 and operated as a country club in the Powell Valley section of Wise County.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; granting of mixed beverage licenses to Meadows Golf and Swim Club, etc.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N) (Y: 83 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) (Y: 35 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) (Y: 82 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0589) | |
2017-03-16 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 589 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2185ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (83-Y 14-N) |
2017-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (35-Y 5-N) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (14-Y 1-N) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (82-Y 16-N) |
2017-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103165D-E |
2017-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2185E |
2017-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (16-Y 6-N) |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (4-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103165D |